U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00881
  • Case Name: Crawford v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 06, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 01, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 10, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 10, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.