U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00887
  • Case Name: Dority et al v. Neiswanger et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 17, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sanctions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.