U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00886
  • Case Name: Ballet Oklahoma Inc v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 22, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.