U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00891
  • Case Name: Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • February 15, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.