U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00884
  • Case Name: Clothier v. Health Care Service Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.