U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00608
  • Case Name: Tyner v. Hi Q Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sealed Reply]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sealed Reply]
  • November 03, 2022: [Surreply]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 01, 2022: [Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 24, 2022: [Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Sealed Response]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Seal Document]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.