U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00888
  • Case Name: Lynn v. Grant
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order for Response]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 09, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 09, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.