U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00896
  • Case Name: Hill v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • March 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 10, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.