U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00893
  • Case Name: Crenwelge v. Cale et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.