U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00872
  • Case Name: Mills v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • June 16, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 01, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • December 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.