U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00898
  • Case Name: Ford v. Receivable Management Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 06, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.