U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00901
  • Case Name: Lee v. Huang et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List - Expert]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 09, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.