U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00899
  • Case Name: Plater v. Poirot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Exhibit]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2022: [Special Report]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2022: [Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 14, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.