U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00903
  • Case Name: Beissel et al v. Western Flyer Express, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: [Stipulation]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Settlement]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 27, 2022: [Add Party]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 28, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 15, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 14, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.