U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00906
  • Case Name: Folsom v. Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 01, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.