U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00915
  • Case Name: Rigsby v. Beshear et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • January 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 15, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 06, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.