U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00913
  • Case Name: BRG Partners LP v. MSBAM 2014-C16 East Loveland Drive LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Report Regarding Patent and Trademark]
  • September 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.