U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00908
  • Case Name: United Services LLC v. Fusion Industries LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Stay Case]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order of Entry]
  • April 26, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [Objections]
  • March 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Objections]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 15, 2022: [Compel]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 11, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.