U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00921
  • Case Name: Phelan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 03, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.