U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00920
  • Case Name: Troutman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 22, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • February 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.