U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00919
  • Case Name: Rogers v. Academy Ltd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 09, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 09, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 09, 2023: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • August 25, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • August 25, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • August 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • November 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 06, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 05, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 04, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 04, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.