U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00914
  • Case Name: Githens v. Securian Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 21, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 17, 2021: [ERISA Admin Record]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Counterclaim]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.