U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00912
  • Case Name: Mifsud v. Gray Media Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 26, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 12, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Ruling]
  • June 30, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 07, 2022: [Objections]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.