U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00916
  • Case Name: Rigsby v. Hope Community Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 24, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 20, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 17, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.