U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00925
  • Case Name: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Big Hitter Holdings LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 30, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 22, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • October 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.