U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00924
  • Case Name: Hutson v. Medicredit Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • May 10, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 12, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.