U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00926
  • Case Name: Cox v. United Parcel Service Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • August 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.