U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00930
  • Case Name: Altadonna v. National Enterprise Systems Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.