U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00929
  • Case Name: Truitt v. Bear et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 17, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Summons Reissued - Alias]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2022: [Special Report]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 21, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.