U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00931
  • Case Name: Bryson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Remand]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.