U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00935
  • Case Name: Cavett v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 16, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 16, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 13, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.