U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00934
  • Case Name: Wooten v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 22, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • April 11, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • March 07, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 02, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • September 22, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • September 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.