U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00937
  • Case Name: Avila v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 04, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order for Response]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.