U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00936
  • Case Name: Slama v. Salazr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • December 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 04, 2022: [Receipt]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Service by Publication]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.