U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00939
  • Case Name: Burns et al v. American Pizza Partners LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 28, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.