U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00941
  • Case Name: De Leon v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • December 27, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition (Amended)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 15, 2021: [Receipt]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 24, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 24, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.