U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00945
  • Case Name: Isaacs et al v. Total Aggregate LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • March 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • March 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 03, 2022: [Expedite]
  • March 03, 2022: [Show Cause]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 24, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.