U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00944
  • Case Name: Ezell et al v. CSAA General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 20, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 13, 2023: [Counter Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 06, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 06, 2023: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • January 06, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.