U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00942
  • Case Name: Reynolds v. Prep Network LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2021: [Remand]
  • October 07, 2021: [Certificate]
  • October 07, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • October 01, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [Compel]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.