U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00943
  • Case Name: Young v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 04, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 04, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • October 15, 2021: [Receipt]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.