U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00948
  • Case Name: Grammer et al v. Shawnee City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.