U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00946
  • Case Name: Bowie et al v. Phoenix Financial Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Strike]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 10, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 26, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2021: [Response to Non - Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.