U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00950
  • Case Name: Scarberry v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Objections]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • March 22, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.