U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00949
  • Case Name: Beard v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • April 25, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 29, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.