U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00954
  • Case Name: Blevins v. Transworld Systems Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.