U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00955
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Rodges et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.