U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00953
  • Case Name: DeCory v. Laney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.