U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00959
  • Case Name: Aloba v. LNU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 29, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.