U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00952
  • Case Name: Folsom v. Warren et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 16, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.