U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00971
  • Case Name: Ramirez v. Kay County Justice Facilities Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Leave]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 23, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 24, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Ruling]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Objections]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Lift Stay]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.